This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 06:22:37 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS STARLING, LYNDSEY

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STARLING, LYNDSEY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNY BARRETT, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNY BARRETT

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

STARLING, LYNDSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE JESUS, JOHN BACUS

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/02/2021:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: LYNDSEY STARLING 12/21/21 @9AM

09/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: LYNDSEY STARLING 12/21/21 @9AM

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/07/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/07/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED:LINDSEY STARLING 12/2/21

12/07/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED:LINDSEY STARLING 12/2/21

CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

05/05/2022:CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

 

Docket Entries

05/05/2022

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2021

HearingEvent Date: 12/21/2021 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED:LINDSEY STARLING 12/2/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: LYNDSEY STARLING 12/21/21 @9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 12/21/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 185805

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021

DocketCase 452021SC000578SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/2/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less