This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 06:20:35 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS SANCHEZ, ASHLEY

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANCHEZ, ASHLEY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY BARRETT and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

JENNY BARRETT

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

SANCHEZ, ASHLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE JESUS, JOHN BACUS

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/07/2021:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/07/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/07/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/07/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: ASHLEY SANCHEZ

09/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: ASHLEY SANCHEZ

STIPULATION

10/25/2021:STIPULATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/21/2021 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ASHLEY SANCHEZ 12/21/21 @ 9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 12/21/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 185898

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase 452021SC000585SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/7/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE JESUS , JOHN BACUS