This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/30/2019 at 15:32:40 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS PELFREY, ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PELFREY, ANTHONY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

PELFREY, ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/07/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/07/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ANTHONY PELFREY

08/07/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ANTHONY PELFREY

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

08/07/2019:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

08/07/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/07/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED: ANTHONY PELFREY

08/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: ANTHONY PELFREY

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANTHONY PELFREY 8/14/19

08/16/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANTHONY PELFREY 8/14/19

EFILING DUPLICATE:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSIGNED BY SO

08/19/2019:EFILING DUPLICATE:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSIGNED BY SO

ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

08/21/2019:ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

08/21/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILING DUPLICATE:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSIGNED BY SO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANTHONY PELFREY 8/14/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ANTHONY PELFREY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 10/8/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 148930

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ANTHONY PELFREY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000380SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/7/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2019

DocketEvent Date: 10/08/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: YX HISTORIC COURTROOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less