This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 13:22:40 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS KIRKPATRICK, BROOKE

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIRKPATRICK, BROOKE. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

KIRKPATRICK, BROOKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/12/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/12/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

12/12/2019:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/12/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/12/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/12/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: BROOKE KIRKPATRICK

12/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: BROOKE KIRKPATRICK

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/26/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

12/31/2019:ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BROOKE KIRKPATRICK 01/23/2020

01/25/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BROOKE KIRKPATRICK 01/23/2020

DEFAULT: B KIRKPATRICK

01/28/2020:DEFAULT: B KIRKPATRICK

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

02/17/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

02/17/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING: EXHIBITS

02/17/2020:NOTICE OF FILING: EXHIBITS

CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: FROM: J. ROSEN

02/25/2020:CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: FROM: J. ROSEN

CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT

02/25/2020:CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/25/2020

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: FROM: J. ROSEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF FILING: EXHIBITS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020

HearingEvent Date: 01/28/2020 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT: B KIRKPATRICK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BROOKE KIRKPATRICK 01/23/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
12/13/2019

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 156747

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000619SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 12/12/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less