This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 13:18:27 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS JONES JR, PAUL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONES JR, PAUL. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

JONES JR, PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/12/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/12/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

12/12/2019:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/12/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/12/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: PAUL JONES JR

12/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: PAUL JONES JR

ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

12/31/2019:ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/31/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PAUL JONES JR. 01/13/2020

01/17/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PAUL JONES JR. 01/13/2020

DEFAULT: P JONES

01/31/2020:DEFAULT: P JONES

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

08/12/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

08/12/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING: EXHIBITS

08/12/2020:NOTICE OF FILING: EXHIBITS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF FILING: EXHIBITS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020

HearingEvent Date: 01/31/2020 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT: P JONES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PAUL JONES JR. 01/13/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: PAUL JONES JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2019

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 1/31/2020 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2019

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 156755

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000624SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 12/12/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less