This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/29/2021 at 12:00:31 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS HALL, JOSHUA J

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HALL, JOSHUA J. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNY BARRETT and BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNY BARRETT

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

HALL, JOSHUA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

04/26/2021:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/26/2021:COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/26/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

04/26/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/26/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: JOSHUA HALL 06/29/21

04/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: JOSHUA HALL 06/29/21

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/10/2021:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JOSHUA HILL

06/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JOSHUA HILL

CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- RECORD

07/22/2021:CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- RECORD

 

Docket Entries

07/22/2021

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- RECORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2021

HearingEvent Date: 06/29/2021 09:00; Judge: BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JOSHUA HILL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2021

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 6/29/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JOSHUA HALL 06/29/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 179569

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

DocketCase 452021SC000222SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 4/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less