Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/21/2019 at 17:31:13 (UTC).

PLATT, MICHELLE S, SNYDERMAN, PERRY J Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 PLATT, MICHELLE S, SNYDERMAN, PERRY J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Decedent

SNYDERMAN, PERRY J

Not Classified By Court

PLATT, MICHELLE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Classified By Court Attorney

SAIEG, JULIE ANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • Payment received: $6.00 Receipt Number YX 152365

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT-RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 152039

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Case 452019CP000363CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAIEG, JULIE ANNE