This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/21/2019 at 21:26:17 (UTC).

PINEWOOD POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASS VS SMITH, HEATHER L. Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 PINEWOOD POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SMITH, HEATHER L. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINEWOOD POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASS

Defendants

TENANT #1, UNKNOWN

TENANT #2, UNKNOWN

SMITH, JONATHAN D

SMITH, HEATHER L.

SMITH, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JONAT

SMITH, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF HEATH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTTMANN, DAVID DANIEL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 2

09/24/2018:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 2

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 1

09/24/2018:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 1

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPOUSE OF HEATHER

09/24/2018:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPOUSE OF HEATHER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HEATHER SMITH 080618

09/24/2018:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HEATHER SMITH 080618

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPOUSE OF JONATHAN

09/24/2018:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPOUSE OF JONATHAN

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY: DEFENDANTS

09/24/2018:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY: DEFENDANTS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JONATHAN SMITH 080618

09/24/2018:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JONATHAN SMITH 080618

RESPONSE: J & H SMITH

08/14/2018:RESPONSE: J & H SMITH

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/31/2018:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/30/2018:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

07/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

07/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE H SMITH

07/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE H SMITH

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE J SMITH

07/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE J SMITH

SUMMONS ISSUED: H SMITH

07/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED: H SMITH

SUMMONS ISSUED: J SMITH

07/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED: J SMITH

COMPLAINT

07/24/2018:COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/24/2018:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPOUSE OF HEATHER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HEATHER SMITH 080618

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPOUSE OF JONATHAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY: DEFENDANTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JONATHAN SMITH 080618

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE: J & H SMITH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2018
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2018
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
07/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $462.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018

DocketCase 452018CC000264CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/24/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less