This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Nassau County on 09/12/2020 at 14:35:22 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS SHAW, MARY L Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SHAW, MARY L. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Nassau County, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL, STEVEN FAHLGREN and FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

STEVEN FAHLGREN

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARY L. SHAW

SHAW, MARY L

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ACTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/25/2020:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

08/24/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARY L SHAW

08/19/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARY L SHAW

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

08/19/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC MARY L SHAW

08/19/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC MARY L SHAW

NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/19/2020 @ 9AM VIA ZOOM

08/19/2020:NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/19/2020 @ 9AM VIA ZOOM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/14/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/14/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/14/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/14/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

COMPLAINT

08/14/2020:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF: SUBMITING FLA STAT CERTIFICATION

08/14/2020:NOTICE OF: SUBMITING FLA STAT CERTIFICATION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

08/14/2020:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

08/14/2020:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

COVER SHEET

08/14/2020:COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/19/2020 09:00; Judge: FAHLGREN, STEVEN M; Docket Type: CMC; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX Grand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARY L SHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC MARY L SHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/19/2020 @ 9AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketEvent CMC scheduled on 10/19/2020 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge STEVEN FAHLGREN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $935.00 Receipt Number YX 168522

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF: SUBMITING FLA STAT CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCase 452020CA000219CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan