This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/08/2022 at 14:40:04 (UTC).

MURRAY, JEREMIAH VS DUNN, SEAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 MURRAY, JEREMIAH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DUNN, SEAN. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE and ROBERSON, ERIC C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

ROBERSON, ERIC C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURRAY, JEREMIAH

Defendants

DUNN, SEAN

ELITE ELECTRICAL SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERRICO, MARIO ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE: OF DISCLOSURE

04/07/2022:NOTICE: OF DISCLOSURE

INTERROGATORIES

03/31/2022:INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/31/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/29/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DISCOVERY RESPONSE

03/29/2022:DISCOVERY RESPONSE

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/11/2022:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/10/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: SEAN DUNN

03/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: SEAN DUNN

SUMMONS ISSUED: ELITE ELECTRICAL SERVICES, LLC

03/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: ELITE ELECTRICAL SERVICES, LLC

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/09/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/09/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/09/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/09/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/09/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/09/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

03/09/2022:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

03/09/2022:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/09/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE: OF DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: SEAN DUNN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ELITE ELECTRICAL SERVICES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number YX 193605

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000071CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELITE ELECTRICAL SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Errico, Mario Anthony