This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/16/2021 at 16:36:36 (UTC).

MURPHY, STEPHEN VS MURPHY, SALEM

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 MURPHY, STEPHEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MURPHY, SALEM. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MURPHY, STEPHEN

Respondent

MURPHY, SALEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ELLERIN, SCOTT ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SALEM MURPHY 10/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING: RETURN OF SERVICE -HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: SALEM MURPHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED SALEM MURPHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number YX 186390

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase 452021DR000895DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLERIN SCOTT ROBERT