Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/21/2019 at 16:31:44 (UTC).

MORGAN, LINDA VS MORGAN, ROBERT W

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 MORGAN, LINDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MORGAN, ROBERT W. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORGAN, LINDA

Respondent

MORGAN, ROBERT W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ROBERT WADE MORGAN 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: ROBERT MORGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • MOTION TO SET FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: LINDA MORGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • MARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Judge: FAHLGREN , STEVEN M Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Case 452019DR000879DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less