This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 07/06/2019 at 13:31:51 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS NEVILLE, RONNIE J

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against NEVILLE, RONNIE J. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NEVILLE, RONNIE J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/13/2019:COVER SHEET

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/13/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RONNIE NEVILLE JR.

06/13/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RONNIE NEVILLE JR.

SUMMONS ISSUED: RONNIE NEVILLE JR.

06/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: RONNIE NEVILLE JR.

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/17/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: RONNIE NEVILLE 6/20/19

06/27/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: RONNIE NEVILLE 6/20/19

 

Docket Entries

06/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: RONNIE NEVILLE 6/20/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: RONNIE NEVILLE JR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RONNIE NEVILLE JR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 145481

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000232CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/13/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less