This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/01/2019 at 15:30:33 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MCNICHOLAS, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MCNICHOLAS, ROBERT. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MCNICHOLAS, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/10/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COVER SHEET

10/10/2019:COVER SHEET

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/10/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/10/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: ROBERT MCNICHOLAS JR

10/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: ROBERT MCNICHOLAS JR

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/17/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ROBERT MCNICHOLAS JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2019

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 11/19/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2019

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 152761

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000495SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 10/10/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2019

DocketEvent Date: 11/19/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less