This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 15:02:33 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MAIER, ERIC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAIER, ERIC. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MAIER, ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI

 

Court Documents

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/27/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COVER SHEET

12/27/2019:COVER SHEET

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/27/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/27/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: ERIC MAIER

12/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: ERIC MAIER

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: ERIC MAIER

01/31/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: ERIC MAIER

EFILED ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/11/2020:EFILED ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: ERIC MAIER

03/11/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: ERIC MAIER

NOTICE OF HEARING: 6/9/2020

04/17/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING: 6/9/2020

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: E MAIER 4/6/2020

04/22/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: E MAIER 4/6/2020

 

Docket Entries

04/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: E MAIER 4/6/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 6/9/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2020

HearingEvent Date: 04/14/2020 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX CHAMBE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: ERIC MAIER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2020

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 4/14/2020 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2020

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 162094

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2020

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: ERIC MAIER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ERIC MAIER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 157399

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000661SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 12/27/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less