This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 18:29:56 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC VS SCANLON, JESSICA

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCANLON, JESSICA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

SCANLON, JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

03/04/2020:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/04/2020:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/04/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/04/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: JESSICA SCANLON 04/07/20 @ 9:00AM

03/05/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: JESSICA SCANLON 04/07/20 @ 9:00AM

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JESSICA SCANLON

04/13/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JESSICA SCANLON

 

Docket Entries

04/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JESSICA SCANLON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2020

HearingEvent Date: 04/07/2020 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JESSICA SCANLON 04/07/20 @ 9:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2020

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 4/7/2020 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2020

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 161661

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2020

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2020

DocketCase 452020SC000136SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/4/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less