This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/29/2021 at 14:56:09 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS RUSSELL, INDIA N

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUSSELL, INDIA N. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

RUSSELL, INDIA N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E

Defendant Attorney

THOELE, AMANDA MARIE

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/29/2021:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/29/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/29/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: I RUSSELL

07/30/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: I RUSSELL

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/29/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

08/04/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/09/2021:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: INDIA N RUSSELL

09/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: INDIA N RUSSELL

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: INDIA RUSSELL 10/04/21

10/05/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: INDIA RUSSELL 10/04/21

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2021

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2021

DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: INDIA RUSSELL 10/04/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: INDIA N RUSSELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: I RUSSELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 184021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021

DocketCase 452021SC000484SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/29/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less