This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 10/01/2022 at 15:42:20 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS GUESS, ERIK D

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUESS, ERIK D. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

GUESS, ERIK D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/02/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/02/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/02/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/02/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: ERIK D GUESS

09/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: ERIK D GUESS

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2022

HearingEvent Date: 10/18/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ERIK D GUESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 10/18/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 202139

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000484SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less