This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 06:08:24 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC VS GILLIARD, LISA

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GILLIARD, LISA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNY BARRETT, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNY BARRETT

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

GILLIARD, LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/21/2021:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/21/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/21/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/21/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: LISA GIULLIARD 1/4/22 9AM

09/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: LISA GIULLIARD 1/4/22 9AM

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LISA GILLIARD 11/17/2021

11/19/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LISA GILLIARD 11/17/2021

MOTION: TO RESCHEDULE DF

12/30/2021:MOTION: TO RESCHEDULE DF

NOTICE OF HEARING: 01/25/22 @ 9AM

01/04/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING: 01/25/22 @ 9AM

CLOSING ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

03/23/2022:CLOSING ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLOSING ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/25/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 1/25/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/04/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 01/25/22 @ 9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION: TO RESCHEDULE DF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LISA GILLIARD 11/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 1/4/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: LISA GIULLIARD 1/4/22 9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 186654

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase 452021SC000620SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B