This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/08/2022 at 15:41:41 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS FOUTZ, ROBIN A

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against FOUTZ, ROBIN A. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

FOUTZ, ROBIN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/16/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/16/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/16/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/16/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: ROBIN A. FOUTZ, 01/10/23 @9AM

11/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: ROBIN A. FOUTZ, 01/10/23 @9AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/10/2023 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 1/10/2023 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ROBIN A. FOUTZ, 01/10/23 @9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 205568

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase 452022SC000608SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI