This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/02/2022 at 16:06:16 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC VS BLAIR, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLAIR, STEVEN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

BLAIR, STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREU, JUAN G

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/02/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/02/2022:COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/02/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/02/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: STEVEN BLAIR, 12/06/22 @9AM

11/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: STEVEN BLAIR, 12/06/22 @9AM

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: STEVEN BLAIR

11/30/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: STEVEN BLAIR

 

Docket Entries

12/06/2022

HearingEvent Date: 12/06/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: STEVEN BLAIR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: STEVEN BLAIR, 12/06/22 @9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 12/6/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 204963

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000583SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/2/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less