This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 15:15:23 (UTC).

MANN, DONALD LAWRENCE, MANN, SANDRA Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 MANN, DONALD LAWRENCE, MANN, SANDRA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Decedent

MANN, DONALD LAWRENCE

Not Classified By Court

MANN, SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

PRINCE, TERESA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/04/2022

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022

DocketNOTICE: TO BENEFICIARIES REGARDING INVENTORY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022

DocketINVENTORY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022

DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketWAIVER SANDRA MANN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2022

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
12/08/2021

DocketRECEIPT OF WILL ***COPY OF ORIGINA WILL ATTACHED***

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 189351

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketCase 452021CP000513CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 12/1/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less