Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/21/2019 at 16:30:41 (UTC).

MALUCCI, KYLE B VS MALUCCI, PAIGE N

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 MALUCCI, KYLE B filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MALUCCI, PAIGE N. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MALUCCI, KYLE B

Respondent

MALUCCI, PAIGE N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GREENE, JODY ALLEN

Respondent Attorney

BARKET, GARRETT NOBLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • OBJECTION: TO WIFE'S MOTION FOR MARRIAGE COUNSELING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • ANSWER: TO HUSBAND PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • WIFE''S MOTION: FOR MARRIAGE COUNSELING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE ANSWER AND WAIVER OF APP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: KYLE B MALUCCI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: PAIGE NICOLE MALUCCI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • MARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Payment received: $418.00 Receipt Number YX 151973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Case 452019DR000878DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENE, JODY ALLEN