This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 04/22/2022 at 15:59:38 (UTC).

MALOY, RONALD LEE JR VS KEARNES, TIMOTHY

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 MALOY, RONALD LEE JR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEARNES, TIMOTHY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALOY, RONALD LEE JR

Defendant

KEARNES, TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

03/23/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/23/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PROOF OF CLAIM

03/23/2022:PROOF OF CLAIM

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

03/23/2022:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

03/23/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

03/23/2022:NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED: TIMOTHY KEARNES 4/26/22 @ 9AM

03/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: TIMOTHY KEARNES 4/26/22 @ 9AM

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: TIMOTHY KEARNES

04/14/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: TIMOTHY KEARNES

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: TIMOTHY KEARNES

04/19/2022:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: TIMOTHY KEARNES

 

Docket Entries

05/03/2022

HearingEvent Date: 05/03/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: TIMOTHY KEARNES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 5/3/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 195505

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: TIMOTHY KEARNES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: TIMOTHY KEARNES 4/26/22 @ 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 194214

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000171SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/23/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less