This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/08/2022 at 15:41:53 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS VANDERMAAZEN, MAX

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against VANDERMAAZEN, MAX. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

VANDERMAAZEN, MAX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/16/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/16/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/16/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: MAX VANDERMAAZEN, 01/10/23 @9AM

11/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: MAX VANDERMAAZEN, 01/10/23 @9AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/10/2023 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 1/10/2023 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: MAX VANDERMAAZEN, 01/10/23 @9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 205570

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase 452022SC000609SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL