This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 02/11/2021 at 15:37:06 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS NORTON, HEATHER

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NORTON, HEATHER. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM and JENNY BARRETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

JENNY BARRETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NORTON, HEATHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

01/12/2021:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/12/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/12/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/12/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED: HEATHER NORTON

01/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: HEATHER NORTON

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HEATHER NORTON 2.1.21

02/02/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HEATHER NORTON 2.1.21

 

Docket Entries

04/06/2021

HearingEvent Date: 04/06/2021 09:00; Judge: BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX Grand; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HEATHER NORTON 2.1.21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: HEATHER NORTON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2021

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 4/6/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2021

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 174531

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021

DocketCase 452021SC000022SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 1/12/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less