This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 06:20:49 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS MCCLELLAN, GENNIE

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MCCLELLAN, GENNIE. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MCCLELLAN, GENNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

DRACH, JUSTIN SETH

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/07/2021:COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/07/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/07/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/07/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED: GENNIE MCCLELLAN

09/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: GENNIE MCCLELLAN

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

09/10/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/12/2021:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

12/20/2021:CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

12/20/2021:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

12/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: GENNIE MCCLELLAN 12/21/21 @ 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2021

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 185897

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021

DocketCase 452021SC000584SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/7/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less