This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 04/21/2022 at 16:01:38 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS MARTINEZ, INGRID

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTINEZ, INGRID. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARTINEZ, INGRID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

03/22/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/22/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: INGRID MARTINEZ 5/3/22 @ 9AM

03/24/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: INGRID MARTINEZ 5/3/22 @ 9AM

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: INGRID MARTINEZ 04/01/2022

04/04/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: INGRID MARTINEZ 04/01/2022

 

Docket Entries

05/03/2022

HearingEvent Date: 05/03/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: INGRID MARTINEZ 04/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2022

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 5/3/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: INGRID MARTINEZ 5/3/22 @ 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 194255

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000175SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less