This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/19/2019 at 15:31:35 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS KAMINOWITZ, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KAMINOWITZ, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nassau County Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

KAMINOWITZ, MICHAEL

Callahan, FL 32011-4704

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL KAMINOWITZ 10/8/19

10/10/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL KAMINOWITZ 10/8/19

SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHAEL KAMINOWITZ

09/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHAEL KAMINOWITZ

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/25/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/25/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL KAMINOWITZ 10/8/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHAEL KAMINOWITZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Event HEAR scheduled on 12/4/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 151810

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Case 452019SC000460SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Event Date: 12/04/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: HEAR; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL