This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/16/2022 at 15:45:26 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS HARVEY, STANLEY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARVEY, STANLEY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HARVEY, STANLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

02/14/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/14/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: STANLEY HARVEY 3/24/22 @ 9AM

02/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: STANLEY HARVEY 3/24/22 @ 9AM

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STANLEY HARVEY 2/25/22

03/01/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STANLEY HARVEY 2/25/22

 

Docket Entries

03/24/2022

HearingEvent Date: 03/24/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STANLEY HARVEY 2/25/22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 3/24/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: STANLEY HARVEY 3/24/22 @ 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 192438

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000109SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less