This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 07/01/2022 at 15:49:50 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS BLOUNT, BARBARA

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLOUNT, BARBARA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BLOUNT, BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/01/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/01/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/01/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/01/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

06/01/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED: BARBARA BLOUNT

06/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: BARBARA BLOUNT

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/27/2022:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/27/2022:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

07/19/2022

HearingEvent Date: 07/19/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 7/19/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: BARBARA BLOUNT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 197367

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000302SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/1/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less