This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 06:34:27 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS BLALOCK, CHRISTY

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLALOCK, CHRISTY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BLALOCK, CHRISTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/20/2021:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/20/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/20/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

COMPLAINT

10/20/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10/20/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: CHRISTY BLALOCK 02/01/22 @ 9AM

10/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: CHRISTY BLALOCK 02/01/22 @ 9AM

STIPULATION

11/05/2021:STIPULATION

CLOSING ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

01/11/2022:CLOSING ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

NON CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/25/2022:NON CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

04/25/2022:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

04/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNON CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCLOSING ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: CHRISTY BLALOCK 02/01/22 @ 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2021

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 187831

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021

DocketCase 452021SC000677SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 10/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less