This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/20/2019 at 15:30:59 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS BARRY, JEREMY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARRY, JEREMY. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DONALD MORAN JR, POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nassau County Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DONALD MORAN JR

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BARRY, JEREMY

Callahan, FL 32011-7705

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JEREMY BARRY 10/15/19

10/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JEREMY BARRY 10/15/19

SUMMONS ISSUED:JEREMY BERRY

09/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED:JEREMY BERRY

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/27/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/27/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JEREMY BARRY 10/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED:JEREMY BERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Event PRE scheduled on 12/3/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Event PRE scheduled on 12/3/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge DONALD MORAN JR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 152027

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Case 452019SC000473SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Event Date: 12/03/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL