This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/09/2022 at 14:39:09 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC VS ALLEN, BRYAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALLEN, BRYAN. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE, ROBERSON, ERIC C and ERIC ROBERSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

ROBERSON, ERIC C

ERIC ROBERSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

ALLEN, BRYAN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRYAN ALLEN

CARTESIAN POINTE PROPERTY OWNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOANNE MCCORMICK 03/21/2022

04/01/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOANNE MCCORMICK 03/21/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LASHA LUCAS 03/18/2022

04/01/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LASHA LUCAS 03/18/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BRYAN ALLEN 03/18/2022

04/01/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BRYAN ALLEN 03/18/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER

03/31/2022:CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOANNE MCCORMICK, REG AGENT 03/21/2022

03/23/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOANNE MCCORMICK, REG AGENT 03/21/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LASHA LUCAS 3/18/2022

03/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LASHA LUCAS 3/18/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BRYAN ALLEN 3/18/2022

03/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BRYAN ALLEN 3/18/2022

NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

03/11/2022:NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRYAN ALLEN

03/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRYAN ALLEN

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC: CARTESIAN POINTE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

03/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC: CARTESIAN POINTE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC: BRYAN ALLEN

03/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC: BRYAN ALLEN

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/11/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/11/2022:COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE: FL.STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

03/11/2022:CERTIFICATE: FL.STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

03/11/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/02/2022 10:30; Judge: ROBERSON, ERIC C; Docket Type: CMC; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOANNE MCCORMICK 03/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LASHA LUCAS 03/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BRYAN ALLEN 03/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOANNE MCCORMICK, REG AGENT 03/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LASHA LUCAS 3/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BRYAN ALLEN 3/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRYAN ALLEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE: FL.STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $935.00 Receipt Number YX 193744

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $935.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000074CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARTESIAN POINTE PROPERTY OWNE is a litigant

Latest cases where Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan