This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:18:00 (UTC).

KLINE, LAWRENCE DELL JR, WILSON, THOMAS MICHAEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 KLINE, LAWRENCE DELL JR, WILSON, THOMAS MICHAEL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WILSON, THOMAS MICHAEL

CLOER, PATSY TYSON

Decedent

KLINE, LAWRENCE DELL JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTIN, JOSHUA KENNETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT-RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER NASSAU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 185481

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE THOMAS MICHAEL WILSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION BY PETITIONER THOMAS MICHAEL WILSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase 452021CP000363CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN, JOSHUA KENNETH