This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/29/2021 at 13:20:14 (UTC).

KIRBY, KATHLEEN ANNE VS HOOPER MILLER, LAKEASHA

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 KIRBY, KATHLEEN ANNE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOOPER MILLER, LAKEASHA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM and JENNY BARRETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

JENNY BARRETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIRBY, KATHLEEN ANNE

Defendant

HOOPER MILLER, LAKEASHA

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/07/2021:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/07/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PROOF OF CLAIM

06/07/2021:PROOF OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

06/07/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

06/07/2021:NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

06/07/2021:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

SUMMONS ISSUED: LAKEASHA HOOPER AKA MILLER

06/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: LAKEASHA HOOPER AKA MILLER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LAKEASHA HOOPER 06/06/21

06/24/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LAKEASHA HOOPER 06/06/21

 

Docket Entries

08/10/2021

HearingEvent Date: 08/10/2021 09:00; Judge: BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LAKEASHA HOOPER 06/06/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 8/10/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: LAKEASHA HOOPER AKA MILLER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 181320

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketCase 452021SC000340SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/4/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less