This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/12/2022 at 16:54:26 (UTC).

KILBY, WILLIAM HARRELL VS MOORE, JAMES

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 KILBY, WILLIAM HARRELL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MOORE, JAMES. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL, JAMES HUNT, JAMES DANIEL and DANIEL, JAMES H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

JAMES DANIEL

DANIEL, JAMES H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KILBY, WILLIAM HARRELL

Respondent

MOORE, JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket2ND EXTENDED DV ORDER SETTING HEARING: 3/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket2ND EXTENDED DV ORDER SET HRNG TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 3/23/2022 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge JAMES DANIEL presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JAMES MOORE JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: WILLIAM KILBY 2/23/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: WILLIAM KILBY 2/18/2022 11:26AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDV EXTENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING: 3/16/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDV ORDER SETTING HEARING: 02/23/2022 8:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDV ORDER SET HRNG TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF INJUNCTION PROCEDURES AND COURT DATE & TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDV PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 2/23/2022 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge JAMES DANIEL presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCase 452022DR000126DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketJudge: DANIEL , JAMES H assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less