This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/23/2019 at 06:02:57 (UTC).

JOHNSON, CARLUS E VS JOHNSON, CHRISTINA L

Case Summary

On 09/29/2019 JOHNSON, CARLUS E filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOHNSON, CHRISTINA L. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON, CARLUS E

Respondent

JOHNSON, CHRISTINA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REEP, RANDAL SCOTT

Respondent Attorney

ROGERS, CHANDA LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • ANSWER AND COUNTER PETITION AND PETITION FOR PARTITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE ANSWER AND WAIVER OF APP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Payment received: $295.00 Receipt Number YX 153207

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 152042

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • UCCJ AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • MARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • Case 452019DR000888DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reep, Randal Scott