This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 15:47:58 (UTC).

JENNINGS, CORINNE ALYSSA VS MITCHELL, KEVIN TYLER

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 JENNINGS, CORINNE ALYSSA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MITCHELL, KEVIN TYLER. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL, STEVEN FAHLGREN and FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

STEVEN FAHLGREN

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JENNINGS, CORINNE ALYSSA

Respondent

MITCHELL, KEVIN TYLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KEVIN MITCHELL 1/16/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KEVIN MITCHELL 1/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CORRINE JENNINGS 1/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDV CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK: TO JSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDV AFFIDAVIT OF COURT DATE AND TIME: 1/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDV PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 1/21/2020 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge STEVEN FAHLGREN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCase 452020DR000034DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 1/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketJudge: FAHLGREN , STEVEN M assigned

    Read MoreRead Less