This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/19/2020 at 15:38:24 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS THOMPSON, KELLY

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMPSON, KELLY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

THOMPSON, KELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/20/2020:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/20/2020:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/20/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/20/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

08/20/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: ZOOM PROGRESSIVE INS

08/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: ZOOM PROGRESSIVE INS

 

Docket Entries

12/15/2020

HearingEvent Date: 12/15/2020 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2020

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 12/15/2020 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ZOOM PROGRESSIVE INS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2020

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 168695

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2020

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020

DocketCase 452020SC000773SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/20/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less