This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/01/2021 at 04:52:05 (UTC).

HORNE, COLEMAN, HORNE, GRACE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 HORNE, COLEMAN, HORNE, GRACE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HORNE, COLEMAN

Decedent

HORNE, GRACE

Not Classified By Court

HORNE, GRACE ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JACKSON, EDWARD PENDLETON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/25/2021

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2021

DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2021

DocketOBJECTION: TO CLAIM - ASCENSIONPOINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketPayment received: $30.00 Receipt Number YX 180976

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $30.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2021

DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ASCENSION POINT RECOVERY LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2021

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2021

DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ASCENSION POINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC OBO COMENITY CAPITAL BANK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2021

DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM COASTLINE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2021

DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM TO BE ISSUED COASTLINE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
02/17/2021

DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2021

DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2021

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2021

DocketWAIVER JIMMY HORNE, JR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2021

DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2021

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2021

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 175885

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2021

DocketCase 452021CP000063CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/11/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less