This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Nassau County on 08/20/2020 at 16:34:15 (UTC).

HOFFLANDER, JANE VS GRINOLD, CARY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2020 HOFFLANDER, JANE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GRINOLD, CARY. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Nassau County, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL and FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOFFLANDER, JANE

Defendants

GRINOLD, LYNNE

GRINOLD, CARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLACK, DAVID RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

POWELL, SHIRCOLA DOMINIQUE

 

Court Documents

CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/21/2020:CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION:

07/21/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION:

DISCOVERY RESPONSE

06/05/2020:DISCOVERY RESPONSE

DISCOVERY RESPONSE

06/05/2020:DISCOVERY RESPONSE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION:

06/04/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION:

NOTICE OF HEARING: 8/6/2020 @ 10:15AM

06/01/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING: 8/6/2020 @ 10:15AM

MOTION: TO BE NOTIFIED OF ALL SURGERIES

05/08/2020:MOTION: TO BE NOTIFIED OF ALL SURGERIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/08/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

05/08/2020:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/08/2020:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/06/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CARY GRINOLD 4/20/20

04/22/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CARY GRINOLD 4/20/20

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LYNNE GRINOLD 4/20/20

04/22/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: LYNNE GRINOLD 4/20/20

SUMMONS ISSUED: CARY GRINOLD

04/01/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: CARY GRINOLD

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/31/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

03/31/2020:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/31/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/31/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: 7/21/2020 @ 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION: 7/21/20 1PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION: PLTFS TO ADVANCE THE TRIAL ON THE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number YX 163076

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketCase 452020CA000101CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Powell, Shircola Dominique