This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:22:47 (UTC).

HIXON, HELEN IRENE, METCALF, HELEN IRENE HIXON Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 HIXON, HELEN IRENE, METCALF, HELEN IRENE HIXON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHIPPS, SAUNDRA

Decedent

METCALF, HELEN IRENE HIXON

Not Classified By Court

HIXON, HELEN IRENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NICOLETTI, ALFRED V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $11.00 Receipt Number YX 186604

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $11.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT-RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCLOSING ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL- TAMMY MARTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL- JOEY MCMURPHY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • DocketWAIVER HELEN GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION -AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number YX 184338

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketWAIVER HELEN GREENE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCase 452021CP000328CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/6/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicoletti, Alfred V