This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/17/2022 at 05:52:46 (UTC).

HIRES, COLBY MORGAN VS MAHAFFEY, SARAH

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 HIRES, COLBY MORGAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAHAFFEY, SARAH. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNY BARRETT, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNY BARRETT

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIRES, COLBY MORGAN

Defendant

MAHAFFEY, SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ALDRICH, ZACHARY DANIEL

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF CLAIM

08/06/2021:PROOF OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

08/06/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

08/06/2021:NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

08/06/2021:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

SUMMONS ISSUED: S MAHAFFEY

08/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: S MAHAFFEY

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/06/2021:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SARAH M MAHAFFEY 10/15/21

10/19/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SARAH M MAHAFFEY 10/15/21

MOTION: TO RESCHEDULE

11/01/2021:MOTION: TO RESCHEDULE

NOTICE OF HEARING: 03/01/2022 @ 9AM

11/04/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING: 03/01/2022 @ 9AM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

11/11/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

AMENDED: NOTICE OF HEARING 3/22/22 @ 9AM

02/08/2022:AMENDED: NOTICE OF HEARING 3/22/22 @ 9AM

AMENDED: NOTICE OF HEARING 3/22/22 @ 9AM ATTY

02/08/2022:AMENDED: NOTICE OF HEARING 3/22/22 @ 9AM ATTY

MEDIATION ORDER

04/08/2022:MEDIATION ORDER

NOTICE OF MEDIATION 5/10/22 @ 1PM

04/19/2022:NOTICE OF MEDIATION 5/10/22 @ 1PM

CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- RECORD

05/13/2022:CLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- RECORD

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

05/13/2022:OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/13/2022

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- RECORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION 5/10/22 @ 1PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMEDIATION ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022

HearingEvent Date: 03/22/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: Aldrich, Zachary Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED: NOTICE OF HEARING 3/22/22 @ 9AM ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED: NOTICE OF HEARING 3/22/22 @ 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2021

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 03/22/2022 @ 9AM DO NOT USE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2021

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 3/22/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY BARRETT presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
08/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 184280

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021

DocketCase 452021SC000495SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/6/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less