This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/14/2022 at 14:35:45 (UTC).

HICKOX, A. MICHAEL VS DREW, JOHN M. Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 HICKOX, A MICHAEL filed an Other lawsuit against DREW, JOHN M. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE and ROBERSON, ERIC C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

ROBERSON, ERIC C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HICKOX, A. MICHAEL

Defendants

OCEAN HIGHWAY AND PORT AUTHORI

DREW, JOHN M.

ZINGALE, JIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY, LOREN EUGENE

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS, CLYDE WAAS

DENNIS, TIMOTHY E.

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

03/15/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/15/2022:COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN M. DREW

03/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN M. DREW

SUMMONS ISSUED: DANNY FULLWOOD CHAIRMAN

03/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: DANNY FULLWOOD CHAIRMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED: JIM ZINGALE

03/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: JIM ZINGALE

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/30/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/31/2022:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

04/06/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

04/07/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

ANSWER:

04/07/2022:ANSWER:

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JIM ZINGALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: DANNY FULLWOOD CHAIRMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JOHN M. DREW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $30.00 Receipt Number YX 194524

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 193914

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000077CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEAN HIGHWAY AND PORT AUTHORI is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY, LOREN EUGENE