This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/11/2022 at 13:34:10 (UTC).

HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION VS MITCHELL, KYMBERLY A. Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MITCHELL, KYMBERLY A. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERON ISLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

MITCHELL, SCOTT D.

MITCHELL, KYMBERLY A.

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SMITH, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCABE, MICHAEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

04/11/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/11/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

04/11/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: SCOTT MITCHELL

04/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: SCOTT MITCHELL

SUMMONS ISSUED: KYMBERLY MITCHELL

04/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: KYMBERLY MITCHELL

SUMMONS ISSUED: THOMAS SMITH

04/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: THOMAS SMITH

SUMMONS ISSUED: UK TENANT #1

04/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: UK TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED: UK TENANT #2

04/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: UK TENANT #2

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/14/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER

04/27/2022:CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

04/27/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: UK TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: UK TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: THOMAS SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: KYMBERLY MITCHELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: SCOTT MITCHELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $350.00 Receipt Number YX 195212

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CC000120CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 4/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less