This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/24/2022 at 17:49:19 (UTC).

HENRY, GLADYS HENDERSON, PARLAND, LATREASE Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 HENRY, GLADYS HENDERSON, PARLAND, LATREASE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERSON, ERIC C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERSON, ERIC C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PARLAND, LATREASE

Decedent

HENRY, GLADYS HENDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

POOLE, WESLEY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCompliance PRBLET has been created with due date of 11/2/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 204524

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CP000493CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less