This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 17:33:44 (UTC).

HATFIELD, ANDERSON E, MINSON, EDDIE M Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 HATFIELD, ANDERSON E, MINSON, EDDIE M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HATFIELD, ANDERSON E

Not Classified By Court

MINSON, EDDIE M

Decedent

MINSON, STELLA LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

HATFIELD, ANDERSON E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING ANCILLARY PERSONAL REPRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCompliance PRBLET has been created with due date of 1/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING: CERTIFIED COPIES OF DOMICILIARY PROCEEDINGS FROM CLING COUNTY, GEORGIA COURT ESTATE NO. M-153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION **COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE AND COPY OF WILL ATTACHED**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 174199

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase 452021CP000002CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 1/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hatfield, Anderson E III