Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/19/2019 at 16:49:12 (UTC).

HARKEY, COURTNEY VS HARKEY, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 HARKEY, COURTNEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HARKEY, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARKEY, COURTNEY

Respondent

HARKEY, MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • ORDER ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY SUPPORT, TIMESHARING AND OTHER RELIEF WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL ANTHONY HARKEY 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • EXHIBIT(S): HUSBAND 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • EXHIBIT(S): WIFE 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • EXHIBIT(S): WIFE 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • EXHIBIT(S): WIFE 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • ORDER REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING 10/11/2019 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: COURTNEY HARKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • MARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY SUPPORT, TIME-SHARING AND OTHER RELIEF WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Case 452019DR000867DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less