This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/05/2021 at 16:44:15 (UTC).

GRANTHAM, STEPHANIE VS GRANTHAM, JOSHUA

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 GRANTHAM, STEPHANIE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GRANTHAM, JOSHUA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL, JAMES H, DANIEL, JAMES HUNT and JAMES DANIEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL, JAMES H

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

JAMES DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRANTHAM, STEPHANIE

Respondent

GRANTHAM, JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PNIEWSKI, SUSAN PAMELA

Respondent Attorney

RHODES, MATTHEW LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/03/2021

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JOSHUA GRANTHAM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STEPHANIE GRANTHAM 2/19/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: JOSHUA GRANTHAM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STEPHANIE GRANTHAM 2/19/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2021

DocketEvent DV scheduled on 3/17/2021 at 0130 PM, YX - Judge JAMES DANIEL presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2021

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2021

DocketDV CLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2021

DocketEXHIBIT(S): P2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2021

DocketEXHIBIT(S): P1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
02/04/2021

DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF INJUNCTION PROCEDURES AND COURT DATE & TIME 2/17/21 8:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

DocketUCCJ AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

DocketDV PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

DocketCHECKLIST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

DocketINFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

DocketEvent DV scheduled on 2/17/2021 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge JAMES DANIEL presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

DocketCase 452021DR000124DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/3/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

DocketJudge: DANIEL , JAMES H assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less